This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/06/2023 at 06:52:31 (UTC).

CHIROCARE OF THE SUNCOAST LLC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 CHIROCARE OF THE SUNCOAST LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHIROCARE OF THE SUNCOAST LLC

Assignor

MANNING, DARQUEZ

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignor Attorney

Philip Friedman

Defendant Attorney

Moses, Marsha Maria

 

Court Documents

Complaint

02/23/2023 - Complaint

Order:

02/23/2023 - Order:

Receipt:

02/23/2023 - Receipt:

Text

02/23/2023 - Text

Letter of Correspondence

02/23/2023 - Letter of Correspondence

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

02/27/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

03/06/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Voluntary Dismissal

08/01/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

08/01/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33822:1294; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33822:1289; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2060048AMT PAID:$175.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:02/24/2023REGISTER#:206CASHIER:FERGUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Filed at Dade County Courthouse; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: PHILIP FRIEDMAN ESQ - MARSHA MOSES ESQ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Text; Event Type: Event; Comments: CASE SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less