This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 03/10/2023 at 14:39:51 (UTC).

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY VS INTERACTIVE TITLE SERVICES GROUP, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INTERACTIVE TITLE SERVICES GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chicago Title Insurance Company

Title Insurance Company

Defendants

Interactive Title Services Group, LLC

Jose, Cesar A.

Dopazo, Arturo

Forbes Title Services Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ostrovsky, Alexander, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

01/05/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

01/05/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

01/17/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

01/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

02/16/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

02/16/2023 - Service Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150221AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:OSTROVSKY, ALEXANDER, ESQFIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP 100 W. CYPRESS CREEK RFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2175COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:01/19/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Jose Cesar A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Dopazo Arturo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Interactive Title Services Group LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3170084AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:OSTROVSKY, ALEXANDER, ESQFIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP 100 W. CYPRESS CREEK RFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-2175COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:01/07/2023REGISTER#:317CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less