Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/07/2021 at 16:53:54 (UTC).

CHARMIN LOGAN VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 CHARMIN LOGAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Logan, Charmin

Defendant

Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Holland, Janelys, ESQ

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/30/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/29/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Production

03/30/2021 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/30/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/30/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

03/30/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/30/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630126AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:HOLLAND, JANELYS, ESQ VERNIS &BOWLING OF BROWARD, P.A. 5821 HOLLYWOODCOMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/01/2021 REGISTER#:263CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citizens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2600093AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:HOLLAND, JANELYS, ESQ VERNIS &BOWLING OF BROWARD, P.A. 5821 HOLLYWOODCOMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/01/2021 REGISTER#:260CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holland, Janelys, ESQ