This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/24/2021 at 18:22:57 (UTC).

CHABAD OF KEY BISCAYNE, INC. VS SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 CHABAD OF KEY BISCAYNE, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chabad of Key Biscayne, Inc.

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erik D Diener

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/15/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

10/15/2021 - Complaint

Email Notice:

10/15/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

10/15/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

10/15/2021 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

10/19/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/20/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

11/01/2021 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/17/2021 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice of Filing:

11/17/2021 - Notice of Filing:

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF REMOVAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: 10/28/2021 Parties: Scottsdale Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2960055AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ERIK D DIENER8751 W BROWARD BLVD STE 404PLANTATION FL 33324-2632COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:10/21/2021REGISTER#:296CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Scottsdale Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3040098AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ERIK D DIENER8751 W BROWARD BLVD STE 404PLANTATION FL 33324-2632COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2021REGISTER#:304CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE@DIENERFIRM.COM;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diener, Erik D, ESQ.