This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 10:43:08 (UTC).

CENTRAL MAGNETIC IMAGING OPEN M R I OF PLANTATION VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS CO

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 CENTRAL MAGNETIC IMAGING OPEN M R I OF PLANTATION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INS CO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-23

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Central Magnetic Imaging Open M R I Of Plantation

Assignor

Scislo, Kenneth

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Dorchak

Defendant Attorney

Foman, William Randolph

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

12/07/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

12/07/2022 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/09/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

12/12/2022 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/14/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

12/21/2022 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

01/09/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

01/10/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/10/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

01/10/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

01/10/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

01/30/2023 - Request for Admissions

Motion to Compel

02/03/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

02/09/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Compel

02/13/2023 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Hearing-

02/22/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS||PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 03/28/2023 @ 10:30AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: State Farm Mutual Auto Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070235AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:KENNETH J DORCHAK1075 NE 125TH ST STE 202NORTH MIAMI FL 33161-5800COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:12/14/2022REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080371AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:KENNETH J DORCHAK1075 NE 125TH ST STE 202NORTH MIAMI FL 33161-5800COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:12/09/2022REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $20.54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less