Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/10/2021 at 22:57:54 (UTC).

CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE

Assignor

VALSAINT, LISSA

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cavada, Derek L, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/28/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Pre Trial Summons

10/16/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

09/30/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/30/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2250030AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2020 REGISTER#:225CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2760060AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQ THE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7875 NW 12TH ST SUITE 11 DORAL FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/01/2020 REGISTER#:276CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cavada, Derek L, ESQ