Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/08/2021 at 06:59:19 (UTC).

CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE VS ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE

Assignor

METELUS, MEDJINE

Defendant

ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cavada, Derek L, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Patrick F Kissane

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

02/04/2021 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion for Extension of Time

01/05/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Dismiss

01/05/2021 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

12/17/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Statement of Claim

09/23/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 32333:3508; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: FTLAUDERDALELEGAL@ALLSTATE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-0 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2250051AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:10/16/2020 REGISTER#:225CASHIER:MARTHAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2730199AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQ THE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7875 NW 12TH ST SUITE 11 DORAL FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:09/24/2020 REGISTER#:273CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL FLORIDA CHIROPRACTIC CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick F Kissane