Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/13/2019 at 04:51:35 (UTC).

CENTRAL BROWARD THERAPY CENTER INC. VS METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 CENTRAL BROWARD THERAPY CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against METROPOLITAN CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Central Broward Therapy Center INC.

Defendant

Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company

Assignee

Fabrizio, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rock, Gregory

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Chackman, Michael B

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

07/10/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Compel

05/24/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

05/23/2019 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Letter of Correspondence

04/22/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Request for Production

03/27/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/27/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/27/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/05/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

02/26/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Strike

05/24/2019 - Motion to Strike

Motion for Extension of Time

04/19/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Request:

03/27/2019 - Request:

Motion for Extension of Time

03/26/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order:

03/05/2019 - Order:

Memorandum of Disposition

03/05/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Email Notice:

02/26/2019 - Email Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

02/06/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

01/17/2019 - Statement of Claim

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2490016AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/06/2019 REGISTER#:249CASHIER:YADIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500057AMT PAID:$80.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/18/2019 REGISTER#:350CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central Broward Therapy Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Metropolitan Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chackman, Michael B