Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/24/2021 at 18:35:30 (UTC).

CELIA PEREZ VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INS CORP

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 CELIA PEREZ filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INS CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perez, Celia

Defendant

Citizens Property Ins Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John S. Bernstein, Esq.

Defendant Attorney

Walters, Hanton Halex

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

04/29/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

04/21/2021 - Notice of Service of Process

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/16/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/16/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

04/16/2021 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

04/16/2021 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Request for Production

04/16/2021 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/16/2021 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

04/16/2021 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/16/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660102AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JOHN S. BERNSTEIN, ESQ. 95 S FEDERAL HWY SUITE 200 BOCA RATON FL 33432 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/17/2021 REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2660088AMT PAID:$400.00 NAME:JOHN S. BERNSTEIN, ESQ. 95 S FEDERAL HWY SUITE 200 BOCA RATON FL 33432 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$400.00$400.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$400.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/17/2021 REGISTER#:266CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citizens Property Ins Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citizens Property Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernstein, John Stat