This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/06/2019 at 18:16:18 (UTC).

CEDA ORTHOPEDICS & INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF HIAL VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 CEDA ORTHOPEDICS INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF HIAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDA Orthopedics & Interventional Medicine of Hial

Assignor

Rodriguez, Manuela

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thayer Musa

Defendant Attorney

Campos, Raquel

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

01/30/2019 - Request for Production

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/18/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Statement of Claim

01/30/2019 - Statement of Claim

Email Notice:

01/30/2019 - Email Notice:

Memorandum of Disposition

03/13/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/30/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Appearance

03/13/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Unavailability/absence

05/21/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/12/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Service Returned

02/15/2019 - Service Returned

Notice of Interrogatory

01/30/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Pre Trial Summons

02/05/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

01/30/2019 - Request for Admissions

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/30/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3330036AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$310.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/06/2019 REGISTER#:333CASHIER:DANTHOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490039AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:THAYER MUSA 9008 SW 152ND ST PALMETTO BAY FL 33157 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.