This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/27/2020 at 14:44:48 (UTC).

CEDA ORTHOPEDICS & INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF DOWN VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 CEDA ORTHOPEDICS INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF DOWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDA ORTHOPEDICS & INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF DOWN

Assignor

Galeano Satizabal, Dairo

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Berger, Martin I

Defendant Attorney

Klassman, Robert

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

04/20/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

04/20/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

05/05/2020 - Voluntary Dismissal

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

04/02/2020 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Appearance

03/31/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

02/19/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

02/20/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/20/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/20/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Amended Statement of Claim

02/20/2020 - Amended Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

02/13/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/13/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

02/13/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31924:3704; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISREGARD; CASE NUMBER ON PLEADING DOES NOT MATCH ODYSSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISREGARD; CASE NUMBER ON PLEADING DOES NOT MATCH ODYSSEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-7 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220005AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/20/2020 REGISTER#:322CASHIER:DAVERNF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440055AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:BERGER, MARTIN I 9700 S DIXIE HWY STE 850 MIAMI FL 33156-2800 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.