This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/08/2020 at 07:50:11 (UTC).

CEDA ORTHOPEDICS & INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF DOWN VS INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 CEDA ORTHOPEDICS INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF DOWN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CEDA ORTHOPEDICS & INTERVENTIONAL MEDICINE OF DOWN

Assignor

CERVANTES CABRERA, KARLA

Defendant

INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignor Attorney

Jeffrey G. Hess

 

Court Documents

Request for Production

03/24/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/24/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

03/24/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

03/24/2020 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

03/24/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/23/2020 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Waiver:

03/23/2020 - Waiver:

Notice of Appearance

03/17/2020 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

03/10/2020 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

02/26/2020 - Pre Trial Summons

Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

02/13/2020 - Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

02/13/2020 - Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

02/13/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM; Hearing Location: South Dade Courtroom 2-5 10710 S.W. 211th Street

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Waiver:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2340017AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:02/27/2020 REGISTER#:234CASHIER:CARABEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440041AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JOHN C LLARENA 5975 SUNSET DR STE 601 SOUTH MIAMI FL 33143-5174 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 8,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.