This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 17:42:45 (UTC).

CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC VS RODRIGUEZ, MARIA DE LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, MARIA DE LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

Defendants

ROSALES, RICARDO

RODRIGUEZ, MARIA DE LOS ANGELES

BANK OF AMERICA, NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adelson, Anthony S.

Defendant Attorney

Knopf, Allegra

 

Court Documents

Discharge/release of Lis Pendens

04/18/2022 - Discharge/release of Lis Pendens

Voluntary Dismissal

04/18/2022 - Voluntary Dismissal

Order Setting Case Status Report Hearing

02/04/2022 - Order Setting Case Status Report Hearing

Affidavit of:

06/14/2021 - Affidavit of:

Affidavit of:

06/14/2021 - Affidavit of:

Affidavit of:

06/14/2021 - Affidavit of:

Notice:

05/10/2021 - Notice:

Motion for Extension of Time

03/04/2021 - Motion for Extension of Time

Email Notice:

02/25/2021 - Email Notice:

Notice of Appearance

02/25/2021 - Notice of Appearance

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

02/09/2021 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Lis Pendens

01/29/2021 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

02/01/2021 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090017AMT PAID:$9.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$9.00RECEIPT DATE:04/21/2022REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Discharge/release of Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33142:835; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33145:761; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: RODRIGUEZ MARIA DE LOS ANGELES; ROSALES RICARDO; BANK OF AMERICA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting Case Status Report Hearing; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON APRIL 19, 2022 AT 9AM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NO SUMMONS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NO SUMMONS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NO SUMMONS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NO SUMMONS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFENDANT, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580235AMT PAID:$50.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:02/02/2021REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2580100AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:01/30/2021REGISTER#:258CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 32326:359; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less