This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/30/2022 at 14:09:05 (UTC).

CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC VS LORENZO, ANA

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LORENZO, ANA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CATALINA WEST HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

Defendants

LORENZO, ANA

CACH, LLC

TBF FINANCIAL, LLC

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

11/10/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

11/10/2022 - Complaint

Lis Pendens

11/13/2022 - Lis Pendens

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/15/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140085AMT PAID:$50.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$50.00RECEIPT DATE:11/16/2022REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: CACH LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: TBF FINANCIAL LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: LORENZO ANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3310111AMT PAID:$410.00NAME:ADELSON, ANTHONY S.ANTHONY S. ANDELSON, P.A. 501 GOLDEN ISLES DR, STEHALLANDALE BEACH FL 33009COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$401.00$401.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$410.00RECEIPT DATE:11/15/2022REGISTER#:331CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33465:4813; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Catalina West Homeowners Association, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TBF FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant