This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/25/2020 at 17:12:38 (UTC).

CASTRO, VIANESCHKA VS BERRIS, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 CASTRO, VIANESCHKA filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against BERRIS, THOMAS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************H-02

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Castro, Vianeschka

Florida PACE Centers

Respondent

Berris, Thomas

Not Classified By Court

NEDA PICURIC, DO

RALPH RICHARDSON, PHD

JANE ANSLEY, PHD

Feldman, Esther, PHD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Litwin, Avi J

Respondent Attorney

REGIONAL COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Determination of Capacity; Hearing Code: DC; Hearing Time: 10:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Determination of Capacity; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: CONTINUED FROM 4/22/2020. NO DOCTOR'S REPORT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: DR FELDMAN - LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Report of Examining Committee; Event Type: Event; Comments: LIMITED / RICHARDSON, PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Determination of Capacity; Hearing Code: DC; Hearing Time: 11:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Determination of Capacity; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: RESET FROM 3/25/2020 COVID-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: EXAMINING COMMITTEE EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: FELDMNAN PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice and Order Regarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: PICURIC DO AND RICHARDSON PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSLEY PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Formal Notice by Mail; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice and Order Regarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450017AMT PAID:$232.00 NAME:LITWIN, AVI J 4434 SHERIDAN AVE MIAMI BEACH FL 33140-3143 COMMENT:CONFIDENTIAL CASE IN ODYSSEY ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3418-MH FILING FEE1$232.00$232.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition for Appointment of Guardian; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Petition to Determine Competency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.