This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/29/2023 at 13:21:17 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER INC

Assignor

Bernal, Graciel

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham S. Ovadia, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/19/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/19/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/19/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/19/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/19/2023 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

05/19/2023 - Email Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120196AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/25/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3200031AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:320CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less