This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/12/2023 at 01:48:03 (UTC).

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS IND VS ALEXANDER BATISTA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS IND filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALEXANDER BATISTA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS IND

Defendants

BATISTA, ALEXANDER

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS MIAMI DADE FLORIDA

FIGUERA, LEIDA C

CARMEN FIGUERA, LEIDA DEL

FIGUERA, LEIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zamora, George S

Byars, David R., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Sherman, David Alan

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/23/2023 - Complaint

Final Disposition Document

08/04/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Motion to Dismiss

08/04/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Order of Dismissal

08/04/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

07/28/2023 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Notice of Hearing-

07/27/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion for Extension of Time

07/14/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Service Returned

07/10/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/10/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/10/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/10/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/10/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

07/10/2023 - Service Returned

Answer

07/06/2023 - Answer

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS IND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33828:4389; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: BATISTA ALEXANDER; BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS MIAMI DADE FLORIDA; FIGUERA LEIDA C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, FILED 7.14.2023, DOCKET #28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: AUGUST 2, 2023 AT 9:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: FIGUERA LEIDA C; FIGUERA LEIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150376AMT PAID:$1,918.50NAME:BYARS, DAVID R., ESQ6267 OLD WATER OAK RD STE 203TALLAHASSEE FL 32312COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$7.50$7.503142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,918.50RECEIPT DATE:05/24/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less