This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/08/2023 at 23:00:26 (UTC).

ARVEST BANK VS RAFAEL CARDOSO RODRIGUES ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/05/2023 ARVEST BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RAFAEL CARDOSO RODRIGUES. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arvest Bank

Defendants

Rodrigues, Rafael Cardoso

Achcar Rodrigues, Izabella Fer

Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melanson, Kyle Robert

Defendant Attorney

rosenberg, joshua

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

09/29/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Final Disposition Document

09/29/2023 - Final Disposition Document

Service Returned

09/28/2023 - Service Returned

Summons Returned - No Service

09/28/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

09/28/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/27/2023 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/14/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/07/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/06/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

09/06/2023 - Lis Pendens

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33908:4590; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Rodrigues Rafael Cardoso; Achcar Rodrigues Izabella Fer; Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3230059AMT PAID:$40.00NAME:MELANSON, KYLE ROBERT1515 S FEDERAL HWY STE 100BOCA RATON FL 33432COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$40.00RECEIPT DATE:09/08/2023REGISTER#:323CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33871:4661; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ESERVICE@TMPPLLC.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less