This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/04/2023 at 09:32:46 (UTC).

ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICE VS PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 ALL X-RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

All X-Ray Diagnostic Service

Defendant

Progressive Express Insurance Company

Assignee

Alberto, Pena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cavada, Derek L, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Miller, Christina R., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

07/24/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Strike

06/23/2023 - Motion to Strike

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/22/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/04/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Response to Request for Production

07/24/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Privilege Log

07/24/2023 - Privilege Log

Response to Request for Admissions

07/24/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Production

07/24/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Request for Production

06/23/2023 - Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

06/23/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request:

06/22/2023 - Request:

Request:

06/22/2023 - Request:

Request:

06/22/2023 - Request:

Email Notice:

06/22/2023 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

06/22/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/22/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

06/22/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

06/21/2023 - Notice of Appearance

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Express Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive Express Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140414AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/01/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140102AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:06/01/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less