This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/11/2023 at 14:43:31 (UTC).

RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC VS PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/08/2023 RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVIERA PREPARATORY SCHOOL HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendants

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser

PETER CAM, as Tax Collector

JIM ZINGALE, Florida Department of Revenue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas H Robertson

Defendant Attorneys

Cruz, Ileana

Dennis, Timothy E.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

08/08/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

08/08/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Related Cases

08/11/2023 - Notice of Related Cases

Notice of Related Cases

08/14/2023 - Notice of Related Cases

Service Returned

08/15/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/15/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

08/22/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

08/22/2023 - Service Returned

Motion to Transfer

08/23/2023 - Motion to Transfer

Motion to Dismiss

08/25/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Affidavit in Support

08/25/2023 - Affidavit in Support

Order of Dismissal

09/07/2023 - Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser; PETER CAM as Tax Collector; JIM ZINGALE Florida Department of Revenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit in Support; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Cruz Ileana; PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser; PETER CAM as Tax Collector

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIM ZINGALE Florida Department of Revenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2440009AMT PAID:$30.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE3$10.00$30.00TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:08/14/2023REGISTER#:244CASHIER:TCOBB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser; PETER CAM as Tax Collector; JIM ZINGALE Florida Department of Revenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Related Cases; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110199AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:THOMAS H ROBERTSON200 S BISCAYNE BLVD STE 300MIAMI FL 33131-5344COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:08/09/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less