This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/03/2023 at 09:56:29 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE F VS DANIEL ALBERTO CUEVA AGUILAR ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE F filed an Other lawsuit against DANIEL ALBERTO CUEVA AGUILAR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee f

Defendants

DANIEL ALBERTO CUEVA AGUILAR

MIRASSOU CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, F

POPULAR BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Duggar, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/03/2023 - Complaint

Service Returned

05/30/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/24/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/24/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/24/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

05/24/2023 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/09/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: MIRASSOU CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090150AMT PAID:$920.00NAME:JASON DUGGAR, ESQ.GHIDOTTI BERGER LLP 1031 N MIAMI BEACH BLVDNORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33162COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$5.00$5.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$920.00RECEIPT DATE:05/04/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33691:1; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less