This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/17/2023 at 15:36:13 (UTC).

PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 PRISTINE AUTO GLASS, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pristine Auto Glass, Llc

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Assignee

Dunigan, Nicole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorney

Saab, Kemil, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/17/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/17/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

05/17/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

05/17/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/19/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/29/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

07/24/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

07/25/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

08/24/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190424AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220487AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/20/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less