This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 12:29:57 (UTC).

DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 DYNAMIC SPINE AND REHABILITATION CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dynamic Spine And Rehabilitation Center

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Assignee

Exavier, Reganes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Fischetti

Defendant Attorney

Blanco, Jacob P

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/10/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/11/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/11/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Service of Process

04/20/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/01/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Appearance

05/03/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

05/10/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Blanco Jacob P; Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130122AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/12/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160188AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:MICHAEL FISCHETTIFISCHETTI LAW GROUP MICHAEL J FISCHETTI, ESQ 7593BOYNTON BEACH FL 33437COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/11/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less