This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/17/2023 at 05:56:05 (UTC).

IMMEDIATE CARE CLINIC LLC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 IMMEDIATE CARE CLINIC LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IMMEDIATE CARE CLINIC LLC

Assignor

VALENTIN, EFREN

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Flaxman

Defendant Attorney

Marissa Hanan

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/11/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

04/11/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/12/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Appearance

04/21/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

04/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/26/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/26/2023 - Request for Admissions

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/02/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

05/08/2023 - Answer and Demand for Jury Trial

Response to Request for Admissions

05/08/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Extension of Time

05/08/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

05/22/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150001AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CHARLES FLAXMAN5715 JOHNSON STHOLLYWOOD FL 33021-5633COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/15/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180066AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:CHARLES FLAXMAN5715 JOHNSON STHOLLYWOOD FL 33021-5633COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:04/13/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less