This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/09/2023 at 07:50:37 (UTC).

PHYSICAL THERAPY NOW HOLDINGS LLC VS UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 PHYSICAL THERAPY NOW HOLDINGS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Physical Therapy Now Holdings LLC

Assignor

Aynash Frias

Defendant

United Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geffrard, Markendia H

Defendant Attorney

Zamora, Sandra

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/16/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/16/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/02/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Extension of Time

07/24/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: United Automobile Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120130AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/06/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220125AMT PAID:$300.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$300.00RECEIPT DATE:05/17/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less