This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/26/2023 at 00:46:28 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS JUST GRK CORP

Case Summary

On 09/12/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUST GRK CORP. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendant

JUST GRK CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/12/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/20/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/13/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: JUST GRK CORP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210089AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:09/22/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3260012AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/14/2023REGISTER#:326CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less