This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/14/2023 at 01:40:57 (UTC).

PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ELIZBETH JOSEFINA MORALES CARA ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against ELIZBETH JOSEFINA MORALES CARA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PNC Bank National Association

Defendants

Josefina Morales Cara, Elizbeth

Capital One National Association, Successor

Lennar Homes Llc

Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc

Capital One Bank USA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kopf, Jennifer Lynn

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

06/01/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Complaint

04/11/2023 - Complaint

Final Disposition Document

06/01/2023 - Final Disposition Document

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/18/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

04/14/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

04/11/2023 - Lis Pendens

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/01/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33734:4693; Event Type: Event; Comments: & DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS Parties: Josefina Morales Cara Elizbeth; Capital One National Association Successor; Lennar Homes Llc; Landmark At Doral Homeowners Association Inc; Capital One Bank USA N.A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 15. Parties: Josefina Morales Cara Elizbeth

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 14.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: Josefina Morales Cara Elizbeth

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: Lennar Homes Llc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090269AMT PAID:$1,915.00NAME:KOPF, JENNIFER LYNN2424 N FEDERAL HWY STE 360BOCA RATON FL 33431-7780COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,915.00RECEIPT DATE:04/12/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33660:4658; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less