This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/27/2023 at 19:35:44 (UTC).

ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER LLC VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 ARTANG REHABILITATION CENTER LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Artang Rehabilitation Center Llc

Defendant

Infinity Auto Insurance Company

Assignee

Enrileysi, Valdes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cavada, Derek L, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Suarez, Mariana, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Motion for Relief from Judgment

08/01/2023 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Motion to Strike

07/05/2023 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Compel

08/14/2023 - Motion to Compel

AgreedOrder

08/02/2023 - AgreedOrder

Answer and Affirmative Defense

07/03/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion to Compel

08/14/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/14/2023 - Motion to Compel

Witness and Exhibit List

08/01/2023 - Witness and Exhibit List

Response to Request for Admissions

08/01/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Request for Production

07/05/2023 - Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

07/05/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request:

06/27/2023 - Request:

Request:

06/27/2023 - Request:

Request:

06/27/2023 - Request:

Email Notice:

06/27/2023 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

06/27/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/27/2023 - Request for Production

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION FOR RELIEF IS GRANTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Infinity Auto Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110206AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110167AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:06/03/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less