This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/25/2023 at 01:29:41 (UTC).

UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 UNLIMITED DIAGNOSTIC CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unlimited Diagnostic Center

Defendant

Progressive American Insurance Company

Assignee

Noel, Rubido

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, Brion M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/05/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/05/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/23/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/06/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/10/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

08/16/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/04/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190147AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ROSS, BRION M.1 E BROWARD BLVD STE 700FT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/04/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180460AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:ROSS, BRION M.1 E BROWARD BLVD STE 700FT LAUDERDALE FL 33301COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/09/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less