This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 05/25/2023 at 09:50:01 (UTC).

JOSUE MONTANEZ VS AZEEZ FOWZY MANSOUR ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/24/2023 JOSUE MONTANEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AZEEZ FOWZY MANSOUR. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Montanez, Josue

Defendants

Mansour, Azeez Fowzy

City of Miami Risk Management Division

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jorge J Garcia

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

03/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

03/24/2023 - Complaint

Request for Admissions

05/16/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

05/16/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/16/2023 - Request for Production

Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

05/16/2023 - Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm

Request for Admissions

05/16/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

05/16/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/16/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/16/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/16/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13. Parties: City of Miami Risk Management Division

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12. Parties: Mansour Azeez Fowzy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3180360AMT PAID:$20.00COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:05/18/2023REGISTER#:318CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice To Change Attorney Of Record Within Firm; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, AZEEZ FOWZYMANSOUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3071257AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:JORGE J GARCIA2800 PONCE DE LEON BLVD STE 800CORAL GABLES FL 33134-6913COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:03/31/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less