This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/23/2023 at 09:42:06 (UTC).

ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICES CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

All X Ray Diagnostic Services Corp

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Assignee

Alexei, Bel Caballero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

Million, Andres, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/26/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

05/26/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

05/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

05/26/2023 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/01/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/19/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

06/27/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Notice of Appearance

07/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

07/17/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

08/02/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33830:4713; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: Progressive Select Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100528AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL MLAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8MIAMI FL 33122COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/07/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3081051AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL MLAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8MIAMI FL 33122COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:308CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less