This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/13/2023 at 21:04:42 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE, LTD VS EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE, LTD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE, LTD

Defendant

EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

Assignee

JONES, MARISSE ALEXANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Greg Blackburn

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/22/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/22/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/29/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

06/07/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: EAN HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090001AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/26/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: EAN HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220012AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:GREG BLACKBURN3333 W COMMERCIAL BLVD STE 200BFORT LAUDERDALE FL 33309COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/24/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less