This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/15/2023 at 19:31:20 (UTC).

TREASURE COAST SPINE & DISC CENTER VS SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 TREASURE COAST SPINE DISC CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Treasure Coast Spine & Disc Center

Assignor

Parisi, Theresa

Defendant

Security National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patino, Richard

Defendant Attorney

Ireland, Jason, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Interrogatory

05/10/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Extension of Time

08/25/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/28/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice:

05/10/2023 - Notice:

Request for Production

05/10/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/10/2023 - Request for Admissions

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Statement of Claim

05/10/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Appearance

08/25/2023 - Notice of Appearance

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness and Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: Security National Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110087AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/21/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100023AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:PATINO, RICHARDPATINO LAW FIRM P.O. BOX 133877HIALEAH FL 33013COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:05/11/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less