This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 10/09/2023 at 07:20:15 (UTC).

DR HOMESTEAD LLC VS PEDRO J GARCIA AS PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2023 DR HOMESTEAD LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DR Homestead LLC

Defendants

Pedro J Garcia as Property Appraiser

Peter Cam as Tax Collector

Jim Zingale as Executive Director of the FL DOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert E V Kelley Jr

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/20/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/20/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/13/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

09/15/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

09/15/2023 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

09/18/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice:

09/21/2023 - Notice:

Notice:

10/03/2023 - Notice:

Final Judgment by Judge

10/05/2023 - Final Judgment by Judge

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pedro J Garcia as Property Appraiser; Peter Cam as Tax Collector; Jim Zingale as Executive Director of the FL DOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF SETTLEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3260150AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:ROBERT E V KELLEY JRPO BOX 2231TAMPA FL 33601-2231COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:09/14/2023REGISTER#:326CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Peter Cam as Tax Collector

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Pedro J Garcia as Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3150074AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:ROBERT E V KELLEY JRPO BOX 2231TAMPA FL 33601-2231COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/22/2023REGISTER#:315CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less