This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/23/2023 at 00:28:26 (UTC).

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS VS ISMAEL I DELALUZCABALLERO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2023 U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS filed an Other lawsuit against ISMAEL I DELALUZCABALLERO. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U S Bank Trust National Association Not In Its

Rcf2 Acquisition Trust

Defendants

Delaluzcaballero, Ismael I

Delaluzcaballero, Ismael

De La Luz Caballero, Ismael

Delaluzcaballer, Ismael I

Delaluzcaballero, Maribel

De La Luz Caballero, Maribel

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc Sol

Westland Village Condominium III Association Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa E Konick

Defendant Attorney

Martinez, Baldy

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

11/09/2023 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Action - Publication

10/27/2023 - Notice of Action - Publication

Affidavit of Diligent Search

10/24/2023 - Affidavit of Diligent Search

Affidavit of Constructive Service

10/24/2023 - Affidavit of Constructive Service

Summons Returned - No Service

10/23/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Return for Unknown Party

10/20/2023 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Service Returned

10/20/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/20/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/20/2023 - Service Returned

Answer and Affirmative Defense

10/18/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

10/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/29/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/29/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/29/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Proof of Publication; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Action - Publication; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2-MAILOUTS Parties: Delaluzcaballero Maribel; De La Luz Caballero Maribel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Diligent Search; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Constructive Service; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Delaluzcaballero Maribel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Return for Unknown Party; Event Type: Event; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ISMAEL I. DELALUZCABALLERO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Westland Village Condominium III Association Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Delaluzcaballero Ismael I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc Sol

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3160147AMT PAID:$915.00NAME:MELISSA E KONICK6409 CONGRESS AVE STE 100BOCA RATON FL 33487-2853COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$915.00RECEIPT DATE:09/29/2023REGISTER#:316CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33908:2852; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less