This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/22/2023 at 03:02:31 (UTC).

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC VS DOOR 2 DOOR CARS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2023 MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOOR 2 DOOR CARS INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP LLC

GREENBOX CAPITAL

Defendants

DOOR 2 DOOR CARS INC

SAVICKIS AS GUARANTOR, EDVARDAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

04/26/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/05/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/09/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Summons Returned - No Service

07/10/2023 - Summons Returned - No Service

Motion for Extension of Time

08/15/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Order Extending Time for

08/25/2023 - Order Extending Time for

Motion:

08/28/2023 - Motion:

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: SAVICKIS AS GUARANTOR EDVARDAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: DOOR 2 DOOR CARS INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090194AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:05/06/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130124AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:04/27/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less