This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/18/2023 at 01:35:59 (UTC).

ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICE CORP VS INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 ALL X RAY DIAGNOSTIC SERVICE CORP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INFINITY ASSURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

All X Ray Diagnostic Service Corp

Defendant

Infinity Assurance Insurance Company

Assignee

Yoicet, Daveiga

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cavada, Derek L, ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Varela, Nicole

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

08/23/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/23/2023 - Motion to Compel

Answer and Affirmative Defense

06/27/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion to Compel

08/23/2023 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/23/2023 - Motion to Compel

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

06/12/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion for Summary Judgment

08/23/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion to Strike

06/27/2023 - Motion to Strike

Order on Motion to Compel

09/08/2023 - Order on Motion to Compel

Order on Motion to Compel

09/08/2023 - Order on Motion to Compel

Order on Motion to Compel

09/08/2023 - Order on Motion to Compel

Order on Motion to Compel

09/08/2023 - Order on Motion to Compel

Notice:

08/23/2023 - Notice:

Request for Admissions

06/27/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

06/27/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Production

06/27/2023 - Request for Production

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

06/27/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Request:

06/14/2023 - Request:

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order on Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Infinity Assurance Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Infinity Assurance Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020181AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020014AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:CAVADA, DEREK L, ESQTHE CAVADA LAW FIRM, P.A. 7925 NW 12TH ST. SUITE 3DORAL FL 33126COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less