This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/28/2023 at 04:22:06 (UTC).

MANUEL GRANDA ET AL VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/13/2022 MANUEL GRANDA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Granda, Manuel

Garcia, Catherine

Defendant

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hoffman, Steven P., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Hirschkowitz, Michael Steven

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

10/13/2022 - Request for Admissions

Email Notice:

10/13/2022 - Email Notice:

Request for Production

10/13/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

10/13/2022 - Notice of Interrogatory

Complaint

10/13/2022 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

10/13/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Voluntary Dismissal

08/21/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

04/14/2023 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Notice of Appearance

04/10/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Order Setting CM Deadline

02/16/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

02/03/2023 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Motion to Dismiss

01/24/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/24/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Appearance

01/23/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

12/20/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/16/2022 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/14/2022 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Email Notice:

11/11/2022 - Email Notice:

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: USAA General Indemnity Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event; Comments: STREAMLINED PATHWAY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: USAA General Indemnity Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: USAA General Indemnity Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: USAA General Indemnity Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
11/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 10. Parties: USAA General Indemnity Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: JASON.TOM@THEKRFIRM.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2022

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210173AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:HOFFMAN, STEVEN P., ESQ222 LAKEVIEW AVE STE 120WEST PLAM BEACH FL 33401COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:10/15/2022REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: STEVEN@THEKRFIRM.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less