This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/09/2023 at 08:03:31 (UTC).

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY VS USA KROME PROPERTY, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2023 MIAMI-DADE COUNTY filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against USA KROME PROPERTY, LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

Defendants

USA KROME PROPERTY, LLC

ORTIZ, IDALBERTO

ORTIZ, CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonzon-Keenan, Geraldine Teresa

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/28/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/28/2023 - Complaint

Service Returned

08/27/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/27/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/27/2023 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

08/31/2023 - Lis Pendens

Motion:

09/11/2023 - Motion:

Non-Military Affidavit

09/15/2023 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default

09/20/2023 - Motion for Default

Default

09/21/2023 - Default

Notice of Hrg Special Appt

09/26/2023 - Notice of Hrg Special Appt

Order Setting CM Deadline

10/02/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

12/21/2023

HearingHearing Info; Description: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MIAMI-DADE COUNTYS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hrg Special Appt; Event Type: Event; Comments: 12-21-2023 AT 11:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Default; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: USA KROME PROPERTY LLC; ORTIZ IDALBERTO; ORTIZ CARMEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190017AMT PAID:$5.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$5.00RECEIPT DATE:09/02/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33871:3585; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
08/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2240046AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:RONALD L SMITH JRCOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:GOVT CIVIL CIRTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/08/2023REGISTER#:224CASHIER:FERGUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ORTIZ IDALBERTO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2240045AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:RONALD L SMITH JRCOMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE2$10.00$20.00TENDER TYPE:GOVT CIVIL CIRTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:08/08/2023REGISTER#:224CASHIER:FERGUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: USA KROME PROPERTY LLC; ORTIZ CARMEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3090172AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BONZON-KEENAN, GERALDINE TERESA111 NW 1ST ST STE 2800MIAMI FL 33128-1930COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/29/2023REGISTER#:309CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less