This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/10/2023 at 03:53:05 (UTC).

SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN & WELLNESS CENTER, P.A. VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN WELLNESS CENTER, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-05

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMPSON CHIROPRACTIC PAIN & WELLNESS CENTER, P.A.

Assignor

Smith, Kerly

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E Gudin

Defendant Attorney

La Montagne, Rachel

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/31/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/31/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/07/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/14/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

07/17/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Voluntary Dismissal

08/17/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Appearance

08/17/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Service of Process

09/05/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event; Comments: ALLSTATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: La Montagne Rachel; ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33846:4049; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210154AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:07/12/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070096AMT PAID:$80.00NAME:GREGORY E GUDINLANDAU & ASSOCIATES PA 1619 NW 136TH AVE SUITE 2CSUNRISE FL 33323COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$80.00RECEIPT DATE:06/02/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less