This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/11/2023 at 07:54:51 (UTC).

DAIMLER TRUST VS CAR MEDIC COLLISION CENTER LLC

Case Summary

On 04/13/2023 DAIMLER TRUST filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against CAR MEDIC COLLISION CENTER LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daimler Trust

Defendant

Car Medic Collision Center LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul E Wilson (esq)

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

04/13/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

04/13/2023 - Complaint

Motion for Writ of Replevin

06/12/2023 - Motion for Writ of Replevin

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/12/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/21/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Notice of Hearing-

06/26/2023 - Notice of Hearing-

Order:

07/03/2023 - Order:

Bond $

07/07/2023 - Bond $

Writ of Replevin Issued

07/07/2023 - Writ of Replevin Issued

Writ of Replevin Returned Executed

08/04/2023 - Writ of Replevin Returned Executed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Replevin Returned Executed; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Car Medic Collision Center LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2630004AMT PAID:$8.50NAME:ATTY WILSONCOMMENT:BOND APPROVALALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3148-BOND APPROVAL FEE1$8.50$8.50TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$8.50RECEIPT DATE:07/07/2023REGISTER#:263CASHIER:GERALDP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Replevin Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Replevin Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: HANDED TO ATTORNEY Parties: Car Medic Collision Center LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Bond $; Book/Page: 33786:1573; Event Type: Event; Comments: REPLEVIN BOND Parties: Daimler Trust

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: EX PARTE ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK OF THE COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF REPLEVIN IN THE AMOUNT OF $158,600.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: JULY 26, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Car Medic Collision Center LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100280AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:PAUL E WILSON (ESQ)WILSON DALEY, PLLC 1776 N. PINE ISLAND RD, STE 308PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/15/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Writ of Replevin; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130238AMT PAID:$486.00NAME:PAUL E WILSON (ESQ)WILSON DALEY, PLLC 1776 N. PINE ISLAND RD, STE 308PLANTATION FL 33322COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.003134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$486.00RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less