This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/06/2023 at 16:14:03 (UTC).

AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC. VS PEDRO J. GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2023 AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against PEDRO J GARCIA, AS PROPERTY APPRAISER. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN MULTI-CINEMA, INC.

Defendants

PEDRO J. GARCIA, as Property Appraiser

PETER CAM as Tax Collector

JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the FL DOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Risch, Patrick James

Defendant Attorneys

Martinez-Esteve, Jorge D

Dennis, Timothy E.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

07/12/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

07/12/2023 - Complaint

Notice of Interrogatory

07/12/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

07/12/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

07/18/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/21/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/21/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

07/21/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

08/18/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

08/18/2023 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

08/22/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Answer

09/21/2023 - Answer

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/22/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

10/20/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

10/20/2023 - Response to Request for Production

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser; PETER CAM as Tax Collector

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the FL DOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Dennis Timothy E.; JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the FL DOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: JIM ZINGALE as Executive Director of the FL DOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
07/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 7. Parties: PEDRO J. GARCIA as Property Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130081AMT PAID:$30.00NAME:RISCH, PATRICK JAMES101 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 3700TAMPA FL 33602-5195COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$30.00RECEIPT DATE:07/21/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100094AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:RISCH, PATRICK JAMES101 E KENNEDY BLVD STE 3700TAMPA FL 33602-5195COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:07/14/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less