This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/19/2023 at 09:16:50 (UTC).

COLUMNA, INC., VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 COLUMNA, INC , filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLUMNA, INC.,

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

Assignee

Helt, Ronald

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

White, T Roger, Jr

Defendant Attorney

Hanan, Marissa

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

06/12/2023 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Answer and Affirmative Defense

05/18/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Motion for Extension of Time

05/18/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/01/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Interrogatory

08/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

08/28/2023 - Request for Production

Motion:

08/28/2023 - Motion:

Exhibit List

06/12/2023 - Exhibit List

Witness List

06/12/2023 - Witness List

Witness List

06/12/2023 - Witness List

Reply

06/12/2023 - Reply

Notice of Service of Process

05/18/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Response to Request for Admissions

05/18/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

05/05/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Interrogatory

04/26/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/26/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/26/2023 - Request for Admissions

ESummons 20 Day Issued

04/24/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO PERMIT EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Exhibit List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Witness List; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Reply; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3110006AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:04/21/2023REGISTER#:311CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140080AMT PAID:$55.00NAME:WHITE, T ROGER, JR.9999 NE 2ND AVE STE 306MIAMI SHORES FL 33138-2346COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$55.00RECEIPT DATE:04/15/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $99.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less