This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 12/02/2023 at 06:46:43 (UTC).

HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY VS CLAUDIA SANTANA JIMENEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/22/2023 HARTFORD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLAUDIA SANTANA JIMENEZ. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Areces, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Areces, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Assignors

The Graham Company

Hernandez, Medardo

Defendants

Jimenez, Claudia Santana

Gece Services Group LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy R. Lotane, Esquire

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/22/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/22/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/25/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

09/25/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

10/14/2023 - Service Returned

Service Returned

10/24/2023 - Service Returned

Settlement Agreement

11/20/2023 - Settlement Agreement

Order of Dismissal

11/22/2023 - Order of Dismissal

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/27/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

 

Docket Entries

11/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 33985:2017; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jimenez Claudia Santana

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Settlement Agreement; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jimenez Claudia Santana

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Jimenez Claudia Santana

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140115AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:TROY R. LOTANE, ESQUIRELOTANE & ASSOCIATES,PA 1980 MICHIGAN AVECOCOA FL 32922-5729COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:09/26/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Gece Services Group LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: Jimenez Claudia Santana

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3220118AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:TROY R. LOTANE, ESQUIRELOTANE & ASSOCIATES,PA 1980 MICHIGAN AVECOCOA FL 32922-5729COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/23/2023REGISTER#:322CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less