This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/26/2023 at 14:36:49 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY N A VS MARIO CASANOVA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARIO CASANOVA. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company N A

Mortgage Assets Management Series I Trust

Defendants

Casanova, Mario

United States Of America Department Of Housing And

El Prado Homeowners Association Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ullman, Zachary Y, ESQ

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day (M) Issued

06/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day (M) Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

06/08/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

06/02/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/24/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

05/22/2023 - Lis Pendens

Email Notice:

05/19/2023 - Email Notice:

Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

05/19/2023 - Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure

Complaint

05/19/2023 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/19/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day (M) Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 20. Parties: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIO CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3020206AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y, ESQ5300 ATLANTIC AVE, SUITE 303DELRAY BEACH FL 33484-8141COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:06/14/2023REGISTER#:302CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 11. Parties: United States Of America Department Of Housing And

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 9. Parties: El Prado Homeowners Association Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130313AMT PAID:$1,911.00NAME:ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y, ESQ5300 ATLANTIC AVE, SUITE 303DELRAY BEACH FL 33484-8141COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$1,906.00$1,906.003142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$1,911.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:313CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 33720:2067; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Email Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SERVICEMAIL@ALDRIDGEPITE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Verification Form for Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less