This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 06/18/2023 at 02:28:11 (UTC).

LANE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC.( VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/01/2023 LANE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC, INC.(

Assignor

Savard, Michael

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abraham S. Ovadia, Esq.

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/01/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/01/2023 - Statement of Claim

Notice of Interrogatory

05/01/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/01/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/01/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice:

05/01/2023 - Notice:

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/04/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/16/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/22/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Voluntary Dismissal

06/05/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 33738:4452; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 8. Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190038AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/09/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140054AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:ABRAHAM S. OVADIA, ESQ.4800 N FEDERAL HWY STE 204DBOCA RATON FL 33431-3413COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/02/2023REGISTER#:314CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $2,306.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: $1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less