This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/24/2023 at 03:30:12 (UTC).

PHYSICAL THERAPY NOW HOLDINGS LLC VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 PHYSICAL THERAPY NOW HOLDINGS LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Physical Therapy Now Holdings LLC

Assignor

Ernest Andrew Daumy

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geffrard, Markendia H

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/26/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/26/2023 - Statement of Claim

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

06/13/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

08/10/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

08/17/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Motion to Dismiss

09/27/2023 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

09/27/2023 - Notice of Appearance

AgreedOrder

09/27/2023 - AgreedOrder

Answer and Affirmative Defense

09/28/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Interrogatory

09/28/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion to Compel

11/20/2023 - Motion to Compel

Voluntary Dismissal

11/22/2023 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

11/22/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: AgreedOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120002AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:08/11/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 4. Parties: Progressive American Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100025AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:GEFFRARD, MARKENDIA HP.O. BOX 741214BOYNTON BEACH, FL 33474COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/31/2023REGISTER#:310CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less