This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 11/29/2023 at 10:02:12 (UTC).

NOWACCOUNT NETWORK CORPORATION VS ADRENALINE PRODUCTIONS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2023 NOWACCOUNT NETWORK CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADRENALINE PRODUCTIONS LLC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Del Rio, Vivianne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Del Rio, Vivianne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOWACCOUNT NETWORK CORPORATION

Defendant

ADRENALINE PRODUCTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fisher, Stacey S

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

09/14/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Complaint

09/14/2023 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

09/20/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

09/22/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

10/31/2023 - Service Returned

Order Setting CM Deadline

11/14/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice:

11/15/2023 - Notice:

Motion for Default

11/17/2023 - Motion for Default

 

Docket Entries

11/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF MAILING ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ADRENALINE PRODUCTIONS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 5. Parties: ADRENALINE PRODUCTIONS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3210087AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:09/22/2023REGISTER#:321CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2023

DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3120010AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:FISHER, STACEY S2775 NE 163RD ST STE 100NORTH MIAMI BEACH FL 33160-407COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:09/16/2023REGISTER#:312CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less