This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/08/2023 at 16:15:48 (UTC).

SIGNATURE SHIELD, INC VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 SIGNATURE SHIELD, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, South Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Signature Shield, Inc

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Assignee

Arreola, Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Emilio R Stillo

Defendant Attorney

Marshall, Christopher E., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/19/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

Statement of Claim

05/19/2023 - Statement of Claim

Request for Admissions

05/19/2023 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

05/19/2023 - Request for Production

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/22/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

05/25/2023 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

05/29/2023 - Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements

Notice of Service of Process

08/04/2023 - Notice of Service of Process

Answer and Affirmative Defense

08/09/2023 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Uniform CM Order Setting PT Deadlines and Related Requirements; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3070005AMT PAID:$10.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$10.00RECEIPT DATE:05/26/2023REGISTER#:307CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: RE: INDEX # 6. Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3190532AMT PAID:$175.00NAME:EMILIO R STILLO7320 GRIFFIN RD STE 203DAVIE FL 33314-4105COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$175.00RECEIPT DATE:05/23/2023REGISTER#:319CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less