This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 09/18/2023 at 01:56:11 (UTC).

HUGO LARA VS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 HUGO LARA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARA, HUGO

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butz, Kyle

Defendant Attorneys

DeMahy, Danielle K

Badger, Royce B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

09/08/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Response to Request for Production

09/07/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

09/07/2023 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Admissions

09/07/2023 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion to Compel

09/06/2023 - Motion to Compel

Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

09/05/2023 - Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement

Order Setting CM Deadline

08/22/2023 - Order Setting CM Deadline

Notice:

07/24/2023 - Notice:

Notice of Compliance

07/21/2023 - Notice of Compliance

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

05/26/2023 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/25/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

05/25/2023 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Request for Production

05/25/2023 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

05/25/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

05/25/2023 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Appearance

05/25/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Complaint

05/25/2023 - Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

05/25/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice Of Serving Proposal For Settlement; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Setting CM Deadline; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE TO PLAINTIFF'SINITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3030189AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:BUTZ, KYLE2001 TYLER STREET, SUITE 5HOLLYWOOD FL 33020-4566COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:EFILINGSTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:05/26/2023REGISTER#:303CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover Sheet - Claim Amount; Event Type: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less